National Consumer Law Center v. Department of Education
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Defendant: Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2018cv12399
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Education, filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Giron Vives Amended Declaration)(Yu, Persis)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Department of Education. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Category Sheet by National Consumer Law Center. (Yu, Persis) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/19/2018 to flatten PDF) (DaSilva, Carolina).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (DaSilva, Carolina)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Education Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7415271 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Ana Girn Vives with attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yu, Persis) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/16/2018 due to fillable format) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Consumer Law Center v. Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Represented By: Persis S. Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?