Smith v. Souza

Petitioner: Dazell Smith
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson and Steven Souza
Case Number: 1:2018cv12411
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Dazell Smith (McDonagh, Christina)
December 3, 2018 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Given that Petitioner was removed to Jamaica on November 29, 2018, the petition for writ of habeas corpus [ECF No. #1 ] is moot and the motion to dismiss [ECF No. #10 ] is granted. (McDonagh, Christina).
November 30, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steven Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford)
November 30, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven Souza.(Farquhar, Rayford)
November 28, 2018 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Hearing re: petition held on 11/28/2018. Case is called. Government submits affidavit for the court's review and court hears from government regarding removal. Government to file a motion to dismiss on Friday, November 30th as the court sees no impediment to removal. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Farguhar) (Garvin, Brendan)
November 28, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Steven Souza (Farquhar, Rayford)
November 28, 2018 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Steven Souza, superintendent of BCHC, shall be substituted as the sole respondent. The Clerk of this Court shall serve a copy of the Petition upon (i) Superintendent Souza; and (ii) the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. Respondent shall, no later than Wednesday, December 19, 2018, show good cause why the Petition should not be granted. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis shall be terminated as moot.(PSSA, 3)
November 26, 2018 6 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST071546 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 23, 2018 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 23, 2018 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Castilla, Francis)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
November 23, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dazell Smith.(Castilla, Francis)
November 23, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Dazell Smith.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Souza
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dazell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?