Escobar Barrera v. Mcdonald et al

Petitioner: Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera
Respondent: Antone Moniz and Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12437
Filed: November 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss by Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz.(Sady, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera. (Doyle, Kerry)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera response to Motion to Dismiss due 1/7/2019. (Russo, Noreen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/07/2019 to File Answer to Motion to Dismiss by Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera.(Doyle, Kerry)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera.. (Doyle, Kerry)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz.(Sady, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Russo, Noreen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of 20 Pages by Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz.(Sady, Michael)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz (Sady, Michael)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Respondents shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. (Attachments: #1 consent package)(PSSA, 4)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry E. Doyle on behalf of Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera (McKillop, Matthew)
November 25, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7424743 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form (Doyle, Kerry) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/26/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/26/2018) (McKillop, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar Barrera v. Mcdonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Arturo Escobar Barrera
Represented By: Kerry E. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Antone Moniz
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?