US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tobin et al

Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Morrie Tobin, Daniel Lacher, Matthew Ledvina and Milan Patel
Intervenor: US Attorney
Case Number: 1:2018cv12451
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Intervene and Stay Discovery by US Attorney.(Rosen, Eric)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. Morrie Tobin waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Shields, Kathleen)
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Kelly on behalf of Morrie Tobin (Kelly, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Dell'Anno on behalf of Morrie Tobin (Dell'Anno, Charles)
December 17, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas E. Zehnle. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas E. Zehnle Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7456614 by Matthew Ledvina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lovett, William)
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Lovett on behalf of Matthew Ledvina (Lovett, William)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. Matthew Ledvina waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Shields, Kathleen)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. Milan Patel waiver sent on 11/30/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Shields, Kathleen)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mireille R. Oldak. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added George M. Clarke III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David R. Callaway. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McDonagh, Christina)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mireille R. Oldak Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7432872 by Milan Patel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greenberg, Ruth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of George M. Clarke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7432826 by Milan Patel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greenberg, Ruth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David R. Callaway Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7432801 by Milan Patel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Greenberg, Ruth)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth Greenberg on behalf of Milan Patel (Greenberg, Ruth)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Daniel Lacher, Matthew Ledvina, Milan Patel, Morrie Tobin. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Shields, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Securities and Exchange Commission v. Tobin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrie Tobin
Represented By: Charles Dell'Anno
Represented By: Brian T. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Ledvina
Represented By: Thomas E. Zehnle
Represented By: William J. Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Patel
Represented By: Mireille R. Oldak
Represented By: George M Clarke, III
Represented By: David R Callaway
Represented By: Ruth Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kathleen Burdette Shields
Represented By: David M. Scheffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: US Attorney
Represented By: Eric S. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?