Bryson v. The United States

Plaintiff: Michael C Bryson
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 1:2018cv12463
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael C Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(adminn, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The United States. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST072406 for #1 Complaint #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 6 Set/Reset Deadlines, $400 filing fee or renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis due by 1/22/2019 (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 Set/Reset Deadlines: $400 filing fee or renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis due by 1/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 12/31/2018.](PSSA, 3)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Bryson wishes to proceed with this action, he must, within 21 days (1) pay the $400 filing fee; or (2) file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in which he answers all the questions in the standard form motion. Bryson may also include a written statement containing any other pertinent information suggesting that he cannot afford to prepay the $400 filing fee. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff on 12/31/2018 with Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.] (PSSA, 3)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael C Bryson.(Castilla, Francis)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The United States, filed by Michael C Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryson v. The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?