Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Ameral
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv12531
Filed: December 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Referring Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Libby, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Libby, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 23 Opposition re #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Certificate of Service filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Libby, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 STATE COURT RECORD. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15, #15 Part 16)(Lara, Miguel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 Letter/request (non-motion) from Patricia A. Ameral. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 Letter/request (non-motion) from Patricia Ameral. (Caruso, Stephanie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 Letter/request (non-motion) from Patricia A. Ameral. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caruso, Stephanie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 Copy re #16 Order on Motion for TRO, MAILED TO Patricia A. Ameral 50B Whitehead Avenue Hull, MA 02045 on 1/9/2019. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 SET DEADLINES AS TO : #15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - OPPOSITION DUE BY 1/30/2019. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered "ALLOWED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. An Opposition shall be filed by January 30, 2019 " re #15 Motion for TRO (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered....REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley Referred for: Full Pretrial and R&R on Dispositive Motions; Motions referred: #6 MOTION (Molloy, Maryellen) Motions referred to M. Page Kelley.
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 DOCKET SHEET sent to Patricia A. Ameral (Belmont, Kellyann)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. (Belmont, Kellyann)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Status Conference held on 1/2/2019. Hearing held regarding whether or not the parties consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Court hears from parties and the parties will inform the court by 1/3/2019 if they consent or not. If not the case will be redrawn to a District Court Judge. Foreclosure is set for 2/6/19. Defendant will send state court record and intends to file a motion to dismiss. Court hears from parties. After the hearing the Court was informed the parties refuse to consent and the case will be redrawn. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Patricia A. Ameral (pro se plaintiff), Matthew J. Libby (by telephone)) (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 Return receipt received for mail (Document # 5 ) sent to Patricia Ameral Delivered on 12/21/2018 (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Patricia Ameral. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Belmont, Kellyann)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Letters submitted by Patricia A. Ameral. ( Restricted to case participants due to personal identifiers) (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Reimbursement of Court Costs Within Indigency Waiver filed by Patricia A. Ameral. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Belmont, Kellyann)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Copy re 4 Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction and Notice Setting Status Conference and Form mailed to Patricia A. Ameral on 12/17/2018 via certified and regular mail. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference regarding consent set for 1/2/2019 03:15 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. If the form is submitted to the Court before this date the hearing will be cancelled. (Belmont, Kellyann)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kinsella, Devan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
December 9, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Patricia A. Ameral.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7445846 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Libby, Matthew) (Attachments 2 & 3 replaced on 12/10/2018 to correct fillable PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameral v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew J. Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Ameral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?