Pedreira v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.
Defendant: Mr. Garny, Dr. Kennedy, Mr. Benard, Dr. Murray, Richard Russel, Dr. Patel, PA Quist, Lt. Hanson, Public Health Services, Dr. Yeh, Mr. Surowaniec, Mr. Patronick, Ms. Gufiredda, Mr. Puzio, Captain Spaulding, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Anna Santoro
Case Number: 1:2018cv12535
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Mail sent to Robert J. Pedreira, Sr. re: [#6] Docket Sheet returned as undeliverable. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Captain Spaulding, Dr. Kennedy, Dr. Murray, Dr. Patel, Dr. Yeh, Lt. Hanson, Mr. Benard, Mr. Garny, Mr. Patronick, Mr. Puzio, Mr. Surowaniec, Ms. Gufiredda, PA Quist, Richard Russel, Anna Santoro and mailed to plaintiff on 1/7/2019 with Local Rule 4.1 and forms and instructions for service by USMS. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 4.1 and Instructions for Service by USMS)(PSSA, 3)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. All claims against the BOP and PHS are DISMISSED without prejudice, and these agencies shall be terminated as parties to this action. The official capacity claim against Defendant Spaulding is DISMISSED. The individual capacity claims against Spaulding are not dismissed. The Clerk shall issue summonses as to Defendant Spaulding and the other remaining defendants. Plaintiff shall serve the summonses, complaint, and this order upon Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Because Plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis, he may elect to have the United States Marshals Service complete service with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of the issuance of the summonses to complete service. Failure to comply with this requirement may result in dismissal of this action without further notice from the court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); Local Rule 4.1 (D. Mass.). [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on 1/7/2019.] (PSSA, 3)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 DOCKET SHEET sent to Robert J. Pedreira, Sr. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Request (non-motion) from Robert J. Pedreira, Sr. (DaSilva, Carolina)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.(Vieira, Leonardo)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pedreira v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Garny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Benard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Russel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Quist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Surowaniec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Patronick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Gufiredda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Puzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Santoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Pedreira, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?