Headley v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Plaintiff: Kendall Headley and Z.H.
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv12612
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 30. ORDER GOVERNING SCHEDULING OF PHASE 5, GROUP 1 CASE-SPECIFIC EXPERT DISCOVERY AND DAUBERT AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS(Halley, Taylor)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Halley, Taylor)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion to Amend (Halley, Taylor)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Kendall Headley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zonies, Joseph)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kendall Headley. GlaxoSmithKline LLC waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Zonies, Joseph)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Headley v. GlaxiSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7463660 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kendall Headley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zonies, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headley v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Headley
Represented By: Joseph Zonies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.H.
Represented By: Joseph Zonies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?