Njie v. Smith

Petitioner: Abdoulie Njie
Respondent: Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS, Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN and Yolanda Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv12640
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re #17 Notice (Other) filed by Yolanda Smith. The government to notify the court, within 7 days of completion, of Mr. Njie's removal.(Tang, Danni)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Yolanda Smith of issuance of travel documents by Gambia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Abdoulie Njie. (Freidel, Irene)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Yolanda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Anita)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Yolanda Smith.(Johnson, Anita)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 Copy re 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer provided to Counsel for Petitioner and Government via email on 1/17/2019. Copy also provided to US Attorney's Office via interoffice mail. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Abdoulie Njie. (Freidel, Irene)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2019 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), by Yolanda Smith.(Johnson, Anita)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), (Second Attorney Declaration). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freidel, Irene)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Yolanda Smith (Johnson, Anita)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. Yolanda Smith, Superintendent of the Suffolk County House of Correction, shall be the sole respondent in this action. The respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. Unless otherwise ordered by the court, during the pendency of this action the respondent shall not transfer Njie outside of the District of Massachusetts unless it is to effectuate his removal. For purposes of this order, effectuating removal includes, but is not limited to, travel for interviews, procedures, meetings, or other events where Njies presence is necessary for the anticipated procurement of travel documents. The respondent shall promptly notify the court if Njie is moved outside of the District of Massachusetts, the reason therefor, and, if applicable, the projected date of Njies return to the District of Massachusetts. (PSSA, 4)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Abdoulie Njie.(Freidel, Irene)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Irene C. Freidel re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Attorney Declaration) by Abdoulie Njie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Freidel, Irene)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Abdoulie Njie re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Abdoulie Njie. (Freidel, Irene)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7469855 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Abdoulie Njie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Freidel, Irene) (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 12/27/2018 to correct fillable PDF formatting) (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Njie v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff STEVEN W TOMPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Kirstjen M NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yolanda Smith
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdoulie Njie
Represented By: Irene C. Freidel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?