Three R LLC v. Cynosure, Inc

Plaintiff: Three R LLC and Obstetrical Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Cynosure, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv30133
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ..... Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 02:45 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cynosure, Inc, filed by Three R LLC, Obstetrical Associates, Inc..(Rudich, Fran)
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. Galpern, Eric G. Kahn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 18, 2018 Filing 21 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 10/4/2018 (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 17, 2018 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 4, 2018 to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Three R LLC.(Lesser, Seth)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Galpern and Eric G. Kahn Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-7317920 by Three R LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael A. Galpern, #2 Declaration of Eric G. Kahn)(Rudich, Fran)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael H. Reed, Seth R. Lesser, Jeffrey A. Klafter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel S. Pariser. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jocelyn Wiesner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey A. Klafter, Seth R. Lesser, and Michael H. Reed Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7315345 by Three R LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Klafter, #2 Declaration of Seth R. Lesser, #3 Declaration of Michael H. Reed)(Rudich, Fran)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel S. Pariser Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7315136 by Cynosure, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel S. Pariser)(Pineault, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jocelyn Wiesner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7315122 by Cynosure, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jocelyn Wiesner)(Pineault, Michael)
September 6, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cynosure, Inc. (Pineault, Michael)
September 6, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cynosure, Inc.(Pineault, Michael)
September 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Pineault on behalf of Cynosure, Inc (Pineault, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from Western Division (Springfield) on 8/23/2018 Case Number 3:18-cv-30133. (Danieli, Chris)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston) (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern Division. ALLOWED. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern Division of the District of Massachusetts filed by Three R LLC. (Rudich, Fran)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern Division of the District of Massachusetts by Three R LLC.(Rudich, Fran)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cynosure, Inc. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynosure, Inc Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7270960 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Three R LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Rudich, Fran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Three R LLC v. Cynosure, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three R LLC
Represented By: Seth R. Lesser
Represented By: Michael A. Galpern
Represented By: Eric G. Kahn
Represented By: Michael H. Reed
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Klafter
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obstetrical Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynosure, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Pariser
Represented By: Jocelyn Wiesner
Represented By: Michael J. Pineault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?