Fortes v. Souza

Petitioner: Nelson Fortes
Respondent: Jefferson General, Thomas Hodgson, Christopher Cronen, Thomas Homan, Bristol County House of Correctional and Jail, Steven Souza and Elaine Duke
Case Number: 1:2019cv10042
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 Copy re 11 Order, 12 Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction mailed to Nelson Fortes on 2.22.19 (Russo, Noreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. Please use the procedures relating to Pro Se Prisoner Litigation. (Russo, Noreen)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #9 Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for responding to this motion has passed and the Petitioner has not opposed or otherwise responded to the motion. Accordingly, if no response is received by the close of business on March 6, 2019 the court shall treat the motion as unopposed. (Russo, Noreen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steven Souza. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steven Souza.(Johnson, Anita)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Steven Souza (Johnson, Anita)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Russo, Noreen)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The Respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this order, respond to the petition. The Clerk shall provide the parties with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form (consent package). Steven Souza, Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Correction, shall be the sole respondent in this action. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours' advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. (PSSA, 4)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $5.00, receipt number 1BST072349 for #1 Complaint, (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 against Thomas Hodgson, Elaine Duke, Steven Souza, Jefferson General, Nelson Fortes, Thomas Homan, Christopher Cronen, filed by Nelson Fortes.(Castilla, Francis) Modified on 1/8/2019 (Castilla, Francis). Modified on 1/8/2019 (Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortes v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bristol County House of Correctional and Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Souza
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elaine Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelson Fortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?