Guevara v. US Postal Services

Plaintiff: OMAR GUEVARA
Defendant: US Postal Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv10048
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 13, 2019 to File Response/Reply by US Postal Services.(Driscoll, Jessica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by OMAR GUEVARA. US Postal Services served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. Acknowledgement filed by OMAR GUEVARA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- ROS Civil Process Clerk, #2 Exhibit 2-ROS Certified Mail US Atty and US Postal Svc)(Malis, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica P. Driscoll on behalf of US Postal Services (Driscoll, Jessica)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to US Postal Services. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint by OMAR GUEVARA. (Malis, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint by OMAR GUEVARA. (Malis, Daniel)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OMAR GUEVARA Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7485937 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by OMAR GUEVARA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Demand (Form 95))(Malis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara v. US Postal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Services
Represented By: Jessica P. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR GUEVARA
Represented By: Daniel M. Malis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?