Andrews et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Nicholas Young, Raymond Dunn, Dexter Andrews and Matthew Soler
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10070
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Romero Matter, #2 Exhibit B - Stephen Churchill Decl, #3 Exhibit C - Oren Sellstrom Decl, #4 Exhibit D - Order Approving Class Action Settlement)(Mee, Peter)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dexter Andrews, Raymond Dunn, Nuno Gomes, Titus Royal, Matthew Soler, Nicholas Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Churchill, Stephen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul C. Evans. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul C. Evans Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7514373 by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Paul C. Evans)(Mee, Peter)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Complaint, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment - Acceptance of Service, #4 Attachment - Motion to Extend Tim to Answer, #5 Attachment - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Mee, Peter)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amazon.com, Inc..(Mee, Peter)
January 12, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by email (adminn, )
January 12, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (adminn, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Mee, Peter)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7490544 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion and Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Lizanne Hackett, #4 Exhibit D - 2016 Calendar, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Mee, Peter) (Attachment 5 replaced on 1/14/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). (Attachment 6 replaced on 1/14/2019) (Montes, Mariliz). Modified on 1/14/2019 to convert to pdf format exhibits 5 and 6 (Montes, Mariliz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews et al v. Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuno Gomes
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titus Royal
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Young
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Dunn
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Andrews
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Soler
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Mee
Represented By: Paul C Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?