Levesque v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Levesque
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corp, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Parker-Hannifin, General Dynamics, Cessna Aircraft Company, General Electric Corp, Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Lycoming, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber, A.W. Chesterton Co, Northrop Grumman Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand, Gulfstream Aerospace, Rolls-Royce Corporation, Eaton Aeroquip, Honeywell International, AVCO Corporation, Goodrich Corp, Bayer Cropscience Inc., Meggit Aircraft, IMO Industries, United Technologies Corporation, Continental Motors, Inc. and Union Carbide Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Judge Robert B. Collings
Case Number: 1:2019cv10071
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 135 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Paine, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 134 Magistrate Judge Robert B Collings: REPORT OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION referral. Counsel have reported that this case has settled. The Clerk should isue a 45-day Order.
August 28, 2019 Filing 133 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling ADR Hearing. Counsel notified the court that the parties have settled the matter and to cancel the mediation. (McLaughlin, Tracy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 132 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #131 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice as to defendant Continental Motors, Inc. only. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Continental Motors, Inc..(Zamaloff, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Lisa M. Conserve (Conserve, Lisa)
August 20, 2019 Filing 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (Adams, Kip)
August 20, 2019 Filing 128 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Union Carbide Corporation. (Adams, Kip)
August 20, 2019 Filing 127 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, incorrectly named "Goodrich Corporation individually and as successor in interest to B.F. Goodrich Aerospace, The B.F. Goodrich Company, and Rohr Corporation" only by Goodrich Corp. (DeLuzio, Maria)
August 19, 2019 Filing 126 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Gulfstream Aerospace. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
August 19, 2019 Filing 125 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by General Dynamics. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
August 13, 2019 Filing 124 STIPULATION of Dismissal of IMO Industries Inc. f-k-a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company, Incorrectly Named as "IMO Industries Inc. as Successor in Interest to Adel Fasteners" With Prejudice by IMO Industries. (DeLuzio, Maria)
July 1, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION to Compel by Defense Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bjornlund, Kyle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Roman on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Roman, Marisa)
June 20, 2019 Filing 121 STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Ingersoll Rand Co. ONLY by Ingersoll-Rand. (Terry, Alexander)
June 3, 2019 Filing 120 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered granting #116 Assented to MOTION to Compel. (Paine, Matthew)
May 29, 2019 Filing 119 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion allowed as to Eaton Aeroquip, Inc. only re #118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. (Paine, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Eaton Aeroquip.(Russman, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 117 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company by A.W. Chesterton Co. (McVinney, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 116 Assented to MOTION to Compel by Defendants Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Camire, Lauren)
May 23, 2019 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Electric Corp. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 20, 2019 Filing 114 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant Continental Motors, Inc.. (Zamaloff, Matthew) (Modified on 5/21/2019 to Correct Docket Text)(Paine, Matthew).
May 13, 2019 Filing 113 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
April 3, 2019 Filing 112 First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Jackson, Susan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 111 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Honeywell International.(Bjornlund, Kyle)
April 2, 2019 Filing 110 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Curtiss-Wright Corporation.(Bjornlund, Kyle)
April 2, 2019 Filing 109 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Pneumo Abex Corp.(Bjornlund, Kyle)
April 1, 2019 Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bayer Cropscience Inc.. (Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 107 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Bayer Cropscience Inc..(Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 106 Bayer CropScience's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Bayer Cropscience Inc..(Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc. (Nelson, Monica)
April 1, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Bayer Cropscience Inc. (Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation. (Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 102 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 101 Union Carbide Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 100 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Goodrich Corp.(DeLuzio, Maria)
April 1, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Monica)
April 1, 2019 Filing 98 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by General Electric Corp.(Mohan, Catherine)
April 1, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Adams, Kip)
April 1, 2019 Filing 96 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Gulfstream Aerospace.(Ludlum, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 95 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by General Dynamics.(Ludlum, Robert)
April 1, 2019 Filing 94 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber.(Pickett, Rene)
April 1, 2019 Filing 93 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Ingersoll-Rand.(Terry, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ingersoll-Rand. (Terry, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Filing 91 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Ingersoll-Rand.(Terry, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Filing 90 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by United Technologies Corporation.(DeLuzio, Maria)
March 27, 2019 Filing 89 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Eaton Aeroquip.(Russman, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 88 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Eaton Aeroquip. (Russman, David)
March 25, 2019 Filing 87 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Northrup Grumman Corporation. (Oetheimer, Richard)
March 22, 2019 Filing 86 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Cessna Aircraft Company. (Ruggieri, James)
March 22, 2019 Filing 85 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Avco Corporation, including its unincorporated division, Lycoming Engines. (Ruggieri, James)
March 19, 2019 Filing 84 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Goodrich Corporation. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 16, 2019 Filing 83 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 9/19/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Robert B Collings. INSTRUCTIONS - COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO BE PRESENT WITH THEIR CLIENTS AND REPRESENTATIVES THEREOF WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY. AN ASSENTED-TO MOTION MUST BE FILED FOR ANY REASON WHEN REQUESTING ATTENDANCE BY PHONE AND WILL BE TAKEN UNDER CONSIDERATION. Correspondence related to the hearing should be submitted by email to tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov no later than 9/12/2019 and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing Parties. Counsel are requested to try and accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to confer with opposing counsel and FILE AN ASSENTED-TO MOTION WITH THE COURT to continue the mediation as soon as possible.(McLaughlin, Tracy)(McLaughlin, Tracy)
March 15, 2019 Filing 82 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodrich Corp. (DeLuzio, Maria)
March 12, 2019 Filing 81 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #65 Motion to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket.Denied. The case will be tried no later than April 2020. The parties will submit a proposed case management order within 2 weeks of the date of this order. (Paine, Matthew)
March 12, 2019 Filing 80 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #77 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE November 1, 2019 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE October 15, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
March 12, 2019 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AVCO Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for AVCO Corporation.. (Ruggieri, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cessna Aircraft Company identifying Corporate Parent Textron Aviation Inc. for Cessna Aircraft Company.. (Ruggieri, James)
March 11, 2019 Filing 77 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Bjornlund, Kyle)
March 11, 2019 Filing 76 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Robert B. Collings appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 75 Opposition re #65 MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. filed by Michael Levesque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McCann, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn S. Kaplan on behalf of Goodrich Corp (Kaplan, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn S. Kaplan on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Kaplan, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn S. Kaplan on behalf of IMO Industries (Kaplan, Jacquelyn)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution as of September 2019.(Paine, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 70 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2019. The Court explains the requirements of the session. The parties do not want to proceed before a magistrate judge. The case is to go to ADR during the month of September 2019 and is placed on the running trial list for the month of January 2020. A final pretrial conference will be held during the month of December 2019. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed atleast three months prior to trial month. A joint pretrial memo is due the first Monday of the month preceding trial month. Counsel shall file a joint proposed case management schedule within two weeks. (Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 25, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Oetheimer on behalf of Northrop Grumman Corporation (Oetheimer, Richard)
February 25, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Conserve on behalf of Michael Levesque (Conserve, Lisa)
February 25, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. McCann on behalf of Michael Levesque (McCann, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika A. O'Donnell on behalf of Michael Levesque (O'Donnell, Erika)
February 23, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket. by Defense Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3)(Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Perritano, Judith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries (Perritano, Judith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Goodrich Corp (Perritano, Judith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Riordan, Meghan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries (Riordan, Meghan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Goodrich Corp (Riordan, Meghan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 22, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 22, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Goodrich Corp (DeLuzio, Maria)
February 22, 2019 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parker-Hannifin. (Jackson, Susan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Jackson on behalf of Parker-Hannifin (Jackson, Susan)
February 21, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 21, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Honeywell International (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 21, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corp (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 21, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eaton Aeroquip. (Russman, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Russman on behalf of Eaton Aeroquip (Russman, David)
February 21, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Bernard Guekguezian on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand (Guekguezian, A.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander E. Terry on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand (Terry, Alexander)
February 21, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren K. Camire on behalf of Continental Motors, Inc. (Camire, Lauren)
February 21, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren K. Camire on behalf of Honeywell International (Camire, Lauren)
February 21, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren K. Camire on behalf of Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Camire, Lauren)
February 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren K. Camire on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corp (Camire, Lauren)
February 20, 2019 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Curtiss-Wright Corporation. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo Abex Corp. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Continental Motors, Inc. (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Honeywell International (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Curtiss-Wright Corporation (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle E. Bjornlund on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corp (Bjornlund, Kyle)
February 19, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of Gulfstream Aerospace (Rooney, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney on behalf of General Dynamics (Rooney, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Ludlum on behalf of Gulfstream Aerospace (Ludlum, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Ludlum on behalf of General Dynamics (Ludlum, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gulfstream Aerospace identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for Gulfstream Aerospace.. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for Gulfstream Aerospace Corporation. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Gulfstream Aerospace.(Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D.J. Urbanski on behalf of Gulfstream Aerospace (Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for General Dynamics Corporation. (Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Dynamics.(Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodorus D.J. Urbanski on behalf of General Dynamics (Urbanski, Theodorus)
February 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of Cessna Aircraft Company (Ruggieri, James)
February 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Ruggieri on behalf of AVCO Corporation, Lycoming (Ruggieri, James)
February 12, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A.W. Chesterton Co. (McVinney, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. McVinney on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Co (McVinney, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Continental Motors, Inc. (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber. (Pickett, Rene)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene M. Pickett on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber (Pickett, Rene)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. McCarthy on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber (McCarthy, Daniel)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Meggit Aircraft. (Pickett, Rene)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Continental Motors Inc. for Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc... (Zamaloff, Matthew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Zamaloff on behalf of Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc. (Zamaloff, Matthew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD (certified) by Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Bjornlund, Kyle) (Modified on 2/1/2019 to Correct Docket Text As Counsel Filed the State Court Record Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew).
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stesha A. Emmanuel on behalf of General Electric Corp (Emmanuel, Stesha)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Corp (Shannon, Anne)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Electric Corp. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Corp.(Mohan, Catherine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Mohan on behalf of General Electric Corp (Mohan, Catherine)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation.. (Paine, Matthew)
January 12, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lockheed Martin Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7490659 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1- 7, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Category Form)(Bjornlund, Kyle) Modified on 1/14/2019 (Paine, Matthew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levesque v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corp
Represented By: Lauren K. Camire
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin
Represented By: Susan A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Theodorus D.J. Urbanski
Represented By: Robert S. Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corp
Represented By: Catherine Mohan
Represented By: Stesha A. Emmanuel
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Zamaloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtiss-Wright Corporation
Represented By: Lauren K. Camire
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber
Represented By: Rene M. Pickett
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co
Represented By: Michael F. McVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Richard A. Oetheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand
Represented By: Alexander E. Terry
Represented By: A. Bernard Guekguezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfstream Aerospace
Represented By: John F. Rooney
Represented By: Theodorus D.J. Urbanski
Represented By: Robert S. Ludlum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeroquip
Represented By: David P. Russman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International
Represented By: Lauren K. Camire
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: James A. Ruggieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corp
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Jacquelyn S. Kaplan
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Inc.
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meggit Aircraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Jacquelyn S. Kaplan
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Jacquelyn S. Kaplan
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Represented By: Marisa K. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren K. Camire
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Kyle E. Bjornlund
Represented By: Matthew J. Zamaloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Levesque
Represented By: Michael J. McCann
Represented By: Lisa M. Conserve
Represented By: Michael C. Shepard
Represented By: Erika A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge Robert B. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?