DeGiacomo v. Tilton et al
Plaintiff: Mark G DeGiacomo
Defendant: Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Netversant Solutions II, LP, Patriarch Partners, LLC., Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Netversant Solutions LP, Netversant Solutions, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Netversant Solutions II, LLC and Lynn Tilton
Case Number: 1:2019cv10072
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference and in Further Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC., Lynn Tilton. (Azman, Darren)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 22 before Judge George A. OToole Jr.. Please mark your calendars accordingly.(Lyness, Paul)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Mark G DeGiacomo. (Horne, Jonathan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Horne on behalf of Mark G DeGiacomo (Horne, Jonathan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET SHEET received re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Netversant Solutions II, LLC, Netversant Solutions II, LP, Netversant Solutions LP, Netversant Solutions, LLC, Octaluna II, LLC, Octaluna III, LLC, Octaluna, LLC, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC., Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memo in Support, #4 Attachment)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #5 Amended Transmittal, #6 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit Reservation of Rights, #8 Exhibit Joint Motion in Bankruptcy Court, #9 Exhibit Stipulation, #10 Exhibit Joint Motion Allowed) (Coppola, Katelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeGiacomo v. Tilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octaluna III, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octaluna, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netversant Solutions II, LP
Represented By: Francis C. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners, LLC.
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners XV, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netversant Solutions LP
Represented By: Francis C. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netversant Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Francis C. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octaluna II, LLC
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netversant Solutions II, LLC
Represented By: Francis C. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Tilton
Represented By: Anthony A. Bongiorno
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G DeGiacomo
Represented By: Daniel C. Cohn
Represented By: Jonathan M. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?