McKenzie v. Wayfair Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael McKenzie
Defendant: Wayfair Inc., Niraj Shah, Michael D. Fleisher and Steven K. Conine
Case Number: 1:2019cv10102
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Iain Kaplan in 1:19-cv-10062-DPW. This case, 1:19-cv-10102-DPW, is now administratively closed. (Kinsella, Devan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, and Establish a Briefing Schedule. (Beatty, Barbara)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and Establish a Briefing Schedule (Proposed Order) by Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc..(Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wayfair Inc.. (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian J. Stearns on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Stearns, Ian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline T. Bullerjahn on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Bullerjahn, Caroline)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto M. Braceras on behalf of Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc. (Braceras, Roberto)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Steven K. Conine, Michael D. Fleisher, Niraj Shah, Wayfair Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayfair Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7497547 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Michael McKenzie. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form, #4 Summons in a Civil Action)(Block, Jeffrey) (Attachment 3 and 4 replaced on 1/17/2019 to flatten pdf) (DaSilva, Carolina).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Wayfair Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McKenzie
Represented By: Jeffrey C Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayfair Inc.
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niraj Shah
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Fleisher
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven K. Conine
Represented By: Caroline T. Bullerjahn
Represented By: Roberto M. Braceras
Represented By: Ian J. Stearns
Represented By: Caroline H. Bullerjahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?