Samantha Baptista v. Emirates
Plaintiff: Samantha Baptista and Emirates
Case Number: 1:2019cv10117
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 49:1471
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Hourihan, Lisa)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2019. Initial disclosures by 5/10/19. Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2019. Fact discovery to be completed by 11/21/19. Plaintiff's expert disclosures by 10/3/19. Defendant's expert disclosures by 10/27/19. Expert discovery to be completed by 12/30/2019. Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 1/30/2020. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper., (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Nicholas Gomes for the plaintiff. Matt Manuszak for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY. If because of time change counsel would prefer to participate by phone please reach out to Clerk Hourihan by Monday Morning. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 First JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference on March 11, 2019. (Gomes, Nicholas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Emirates.(Lavoie, Mark)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B. Lavoie on behalf of Emirates (Lavoie, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samantha Baptista. Emirates waiver sent on 1/31/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Gomes, Nicholas)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Emirates. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (adminn, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Gomes on behalf of Samantha Baptista (Gomes, Nicholas)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emirates Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7499279 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Samantha Baptista. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Gomes, Nicholas) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 1/18/2019 because attorney sent new attachment with updated Basis of Jurisdiction and Nature of Suit (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samantha Baptista v. Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Baptista
Represented By: Nicholas A. Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emirates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?