Niemann v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Plaintiff: Cary Niemann
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10118
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 13 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02768-IT et al.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Howmedica Osteonics Corp. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Brown, Baird)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Master Long Form Complaint by Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT against Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (DaSilva, Carolina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1-12 (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order No. 1-5, #2 Protective Order, #3 ESI Order, #4 Fact Sheet Implementation Order, #5 Order Aiding Private Settlement)(DaSilva, Carolina)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:19-cv-10118-IT Niemann v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.. In Re: Stryker Orthopaedics LFIT V40 Femoral Head Products Liability Litigation. (adminn, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (adminn, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7499318 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cary Niemann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Baird)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niemann v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Niemann
Represented By: Baird A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?