Pure Encapsulations, LLC v. TSALEVICH LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pure Encapsulations, LLC
Defendant: Helen Tsalevich, John Does 1-100, Helen Thomas, Michael Tsalevich, TSALEVICH, TSALEVICH LLC and Helen Thomas LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv10120
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 20 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. re #14 Letter/request (non-motion, request to appear telephonically for Scheduling Conference. ALLOWED. (Lara, Miguel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 19 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Lara, Miguel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Strike Answer of Defendants and Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Toms, Keith) (Main Document 18 replaced on 3/12/2019) (Lara, Miguel). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #2 Exhibit) (Lara, Miguel). Modified on 3/12/2019 to separate exhibit that was filed with main document. (Lara, Miguel).
March 12, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Strike Answer of Defendants and Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Toms, Keith)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Answer of Defendants and Dismiss Counterclaims by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toms, Keith)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by Helen Tsalevich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lara, Miguel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 Letter/request (non-motion) from Helen Thomas LLP, Tsalevich LLC, and Michael Tsalevich and Helen Thomas regarding Scheduling Conference. (Lara, Miguel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Martha Brewer Motley. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Martha Brewer Motley Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7570346 by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Thomson, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by James J. Thomson on behalf of John T. Gutkoski (Thomson, James)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Toms on behalf of Pure Encapsulations, LLC (Toms, Keith)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris.....Counsel for the plaintiff is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys, who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the scheduling conference date. (Molloy, Maryellen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by TSALEVICH LLC, Michael Tsalevich. (Lara, Miguel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Helen Thomas, Helen Tsalevich.(Lara, Miguel)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. John Does 1-100 served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; TSALEVICH served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Helen Thomas served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Helen Tsalevich served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019; Michael Tsalevich served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Thomson, James)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Thomson on behalf of Pure Encapsulations, LLC (Thomson, James)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to John Does 1-100, TSALEVICH, Helen Thomas, Helen Tsalevich, Michael Tsalevich. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DeMaria, Timothy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (adminn, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pure Encapsulations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A. for Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (DeMaria, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7499390 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Pure Encapsulations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form) (Gutkoski, John) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 1/18/2019 because attorney sent new attachment with updated Basis of Jurisdiction and Nature of Suit) (Attachment # 3 Corporate Disclosure removed and added as separate docket entry) (DeMaria, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Encapsulations, LLC v. TSALEVICH LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Tsalevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tsalevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSALEVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSALEVICH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Thomas LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Encapsulations, LLC
Represented By: John T. Gutkoski
Represented By: Keith E. Toms
Represented By: James J. Thomson
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?