T2 Biosystems, Inc. v. Michael Kraus
Plaintiff: T2 Biosystems, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Kraus
Case Number: 1:2019cv10156
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T2 Biosystems, Inc.. Michael Kraus waiver sent on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Perlman, Cyrus)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Kraus. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 24, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 01/23/2019, receipt number 0101-7505988. (Tran, Henry)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by T2 Biosystems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs, Other Affiliate Canon U.S.A., Inc. for T2 Biosystems, Inc. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Kraus Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7505994 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by T2 Biosystems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Perlman, Cyrus) Modified on 1/28/2019 to docket Corporate Disclosure Statement as a separate docket entry, dkt. 4 (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T2 Biosystems, Inc. v. Michael Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T2 Biosystems, Inc.
Represented By: Cyrus M. Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kraus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?