Calice v. Souza

Petitioner: Mackendy Calice
Respondent: I.C.E, Jon Hunter and Steve Souza
Case Number: 1:2019cv10269
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #15 Motion for Default Judgment in light of the motion to dismiss having been filed on 3/7/19. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steve Souza by Mackendy Calice.(McKillop, Matthew)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steve Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Farquhar, Rayford)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steve Souza.(Farquhar, Rayford)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mackendy Calice.(McKillop, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Docket Sheet and Copies from Mackendy Calice. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mackendy Calice. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Steve Souza (Farquhar, Rayford)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mackendy Calice. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Relief from Termination of Removal Proceedings by Mackendy Calice.(McKillop, Matthew)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED.Steve Souza, Superintendent of the Bristol County House of Correction, shall be substituted as the sole respondent. Respondent shall, no later than Thursday, March 7, 2019, answer or respond to the Petition. To give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts without providing the Court 48 hours advance notice of the move and the reason therefor. Any such 48-hour notice period shall commence at the date and time such notice is filed and expire 48 hours later, except [i]f the period would end on a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday, the period continues to run until the same time on the next day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or legal holiday. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(a)(2)(C). (PSSA, 4)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Mackendy Calice (adminn, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (adminn, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mackendy Calice. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Castilla, Francis)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Mackendy Calice. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calice v. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: I.C.E
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jon Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Souza
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mackendy Calice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?