Auctus Fund, LLC v. OriginClear, Inc.

Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Defendant: OriginClear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10273
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 3:10 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Counsel for plaintiffs is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all appropriate parties. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF AS TO SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL CONVERSION OF DEBT INTO PUBLIC SHARES AND FOR INJUNCTIVE AND EQUITABLE RELIEF AS SPECIFIC PERFORMANCE AGAINST DEFENDANT ORIGINCLEAR, INC.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to be Entered on Stipulated & Joint Basis. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on appropriate parties. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 is CANCELED. (Pezzarossi, Lisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to be Entered on Stipulated & Joint Basis, with a Certificate of Service, by Auctus Fund, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Auctus Fund, LLC. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Auctus Fund, LLC. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 Reset Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service,, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Halley, Taylor)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Set Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service,, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Halley, Taylor)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, , #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Assets : Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Lovett, Jarrett)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, and Attachment of Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Giordano, Philip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Attachment of Assets, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Attachment of Defendant's Assets)(Giordano, Philip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service, #5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Giordano, Philip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance on Conversion of Debt into Public Shares of Defendant, on a Short Order of Notice, with a Certificate of Service, by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Louis Posner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit of Philip M. Giordano, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction and Equitable Relief as to Specific Performance)(Giordano, Philip)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Expedite on a Short Order of Notice, with Certificate of Service by Auctus Fund, LLC.(Giordano, Philip)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OriginClear, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7537483 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Auctus Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Form js044-1, #8 JS45 Category Sheet)(Giordano, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auctus Fund, LLC v. OriginClear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auctus Fund, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OriginClear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?