Gonzalez et al v. XPO Last Mile, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ramon Gonzalez, Rodriguez Ortiz and Addelyn Marte
Defendant: XPO Last Mile, Inc. and XPO Last Mile, Inc. doing business as XPO Logistics Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv10290
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Filing 70 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Regarding Notice to Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Churchill, Stephen)
February 17, 2022 Filing 69 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Hoffman, Douglas)
February 10, 2022 Filing 68 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Status Conference held on 2/10/2022, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Court instructs counsel to confer and file a MOTION to enter a scheduling order going forward with proposed deadlines, Parties to discuss mediation with their clients and inform the clerk if parties agree to referral to mediation, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 5/19/2022 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (Remote only) before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman), (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Churchhill,Smit/Lounsbury) (Castles, Martin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 67 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (Remote only) before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 10, 2022 Filing 66 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting #56 Motion to Certify Class. (Castles, Martin)
July 21, 2021 Filing 65 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2021 re #56 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Rodriguez Ortiz, Addelyn Marte, Ramon Gonzalez, Case called, Counsel appear by video-conference for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #56 Motion to Certify Class, (Court Reporter: Kristin Kelley at kmob929@gmail.com)(Attorneys present: Churchill,Smit/Hoffman,Lounsbury) (Castles, Martin)
June 25, 2021 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to #56 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz. (Churchill, Stephen)
June 25, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Certify Class filed by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Hoffman, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 62 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 61 DECLARATION re #60 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Hoffman, Douglas)
June 4, 2021 Filing 60 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Hoffman, Douglas)
May 3, 2021 Filing 59 Sealed EXHIBIT re #56 MOTION to Certify Class by Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz. (Burgos, Sandra)
May 3, 2021 Filing 58 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #57 Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibits. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 30, 2021 Filing 57 Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibits by Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz.(Churchill, Stephen)
April 30, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Certify Class by Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Churchill, Stephen) Modified on 5/3/2021 (Burgos, Sandra).
April 5, 2021 Filing 55 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered Granting #48 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery filed by XPO Last Mile, Inc. (Castles, Martin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 54 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2021; Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Court rules granting #48 Motion to Compel, Parties inform the Court that class discovery and the filing of the motion for class certification are on track, Court sets date for hearing on motion to certify class, Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Churchhill,Smit/Hoffman) (Castles, Martin)
February 3, 2021 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Telephone Conference reset for 4/1/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
February 3, 2021 Filing 52 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete current class-related discovery to March 31, 2021. (Castles, Martin)
December 21, 2020 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2021 to Complete Discovery by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
December 18, 2020 Filing 50 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Status Conference held on 12/18/2020, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Parties and Court discuss request for an extension of the scheduling order deadlines, Court directs parties to file a joint motion to extend the deadlines with new proposed dates going forward, Court sets a further status conference, ( Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Churchhill,Smit/Lounsbury,Hoffman) (Castles, Martin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery filed by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Paul Holdsworth)(Hoffman, Douglas)
December 18, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Compel Third Party Discovery by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
September 11, 2020 Filing 47 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 12/18/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Class Discovery to be completed by 12/18/2020, Any expert Defendant intends to use in opposition to class certification shall be disclosed by 2/15/21, Expert discovery and depositions to be completed by 3/19/21, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to be filed by 4/30/21, Defendant's opposition to class certification to be filed by 6/4/21, Plaintiffs' reply due by 6/25/21.(Castles, Martin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 46 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Castles, Martin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 18, 2020 to Complete Discovery by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
June 12, 2020 Filing 44 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 9/18/2020 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Class Discovery to be completed by 9/18/2020, Any expert Defendant intends to use in opposition to class certification shall be disclosed by 10/9/20, Expert discovery and depositions to be completed by 11/13/20, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to be filed by 12/18/20, Defendant's opposition to class certification to be filed by 1/18/21, Plaintiffs' reply due by 2/8/21(Castles, Martin)
June 12, 2020 Filing 43 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order. (Castles, Martin)
June 10, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadline and Reset Class Certification Briefing Schedule by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 41 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 6/16/2020 at 2:45 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Class Discovery to be completed by 6/16/2020, Any expert Defendant intends to use in opposition to class certification shall be disclosed by 7/14/20, Expert discovery and depositions to be completed by 8/14/20, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to be filed by 9/29/20, Defendant's opposition to class certification to be filed by 10/29/20, Plaintiffs' reply due by 11/13/20.(Castles, Martin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 40 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Extension of Scheduling order. (Castles, Martin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time for Discovery Deadline and Reset Class Certification Briefing Schedule (Stipulated) by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 38 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference reset for 3/16/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Phase 1 fact Discovery to be completed by 3/16/2020, Any expert Defendant intends to use in opposition to class certification shall be disclosed by 4/14/20, Expert discovery and depositions to be completed by 5/14/20, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to be filed by 6/29/20, Defendant's opposition to class certification to be filed by 7/29/20, Plaintiffs' reply due by 8/13/20.(Castles, Martin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 37 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND SET CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (Castles, Martin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND SET CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Hoffman, Douglas) Modified on 12/9/2019 (Castles, Martin).
September 5, 2019 Filing 35 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Castles, Martin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 34 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #33 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Douglas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 32 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Phase 1 fact Discovery to be completed by 12/16/2019, Any expert Defendant intends to use in opposition to class certification shall be disclosed by 1/15/20, Expert discovery and depositions to be completed by 2/14/20, Plaintiffs' motion for class certification to be filed by 3/31/20, Defendant's opposition to class certification to be filed by 4/30/20, Plaintiffs' reply due by 5/15/20,(Castles, Martin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 31 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #19 Motion to Compel. The Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is granted as to Document Requests # 8, 10, and 12, and Interrogatories # 2 and 5. Based upon Defendant's representations at hearing that all other responsive documents/interrogatory answers have been served upon the Plaintiff, the remaining requests are denied as moot. With respect to the Defendant's request in their opposition #25 regarding the party's proposed confidentiality order I find that the burden of challenging a confidentiality designation should be on the party designating said material. (Castles, Martin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 30 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2019 re #19 MOTION to Compel filed by Rodriguez Ortiz, Addelyn Marte, Ramon Gonzalez and Scheduling Conference held on 8/26/2019, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing/scheduling conference, Court hears arguments of counsel re motion to compel and proposed protective order, Court rules taking under advisement #19 Motion to Compel; Court also takes under advisement parties proposed scheduling order deadlines, Scheduling order to issue, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Churchill/Lounsbury,Hoffman,Davis) (Castles, Martin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 CORRECTED ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 11:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 27 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/26/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Davis, Benjamin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 Opposition re #19 MOTION to Compel filed by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Davis, Benjamin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 24 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #19 MOTION to Compel . Response due by 7/24/2019. (Castles, Martin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Compel by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Davis, Benjamin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #19 MOTION to Compel . Response due by 7/17/2019. (Castles, Martin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Compel by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Davis, Benjamin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel by Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Churchill, Stephen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Victor Rodriguez Ortiz. (Smit, Rachel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Plaintiff Addelyn Marte. (Smit, Rachel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Plaintiff Ramon Gonzalez. (Smit, Rachel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Davis, Benjamin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam L. Lounsbury. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam L. Lounsbury Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7600873 by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Hoffman, Douglas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam L. Lounsbury Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7600873 by XPO Last Mile, Inc..(Hoffman, Douglas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen S. Churchill on behalf of Ramon Gonzalez, Addelyn Marte, Rodriguez Ortiz (Churchill, Stephen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman added. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. This case is being returned to the Clerk's office to be reassign ed in accordance with L.R. 40.1. (adminn, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Davis, Benjamin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by XPO Last Mile, Inc.. (Davis, Benjamin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form and Civil Cover Sheet. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Halley, Taylor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by XPO Last Mile, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent XPO Logistics Inc for XPO Last Mile, Inc... (Davis, Benjamin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Davis on behalf of XPO Last Mile, Inc. (Davis, Benjamin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by XPO Last Mile, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7541669 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record #2 Exhibit Interrogatory Answers, #3 Exhibit Form of Notice of Removal to State Court)(Hoffman, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez et al v. XPO Last Mile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Gonzalez
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Represented By: Steve Churchill
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Hilary Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodriguez Ortiz
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Represented By: Steve Churchill
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Hilary Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addelyn Marte
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Represented By: Steve Churchill
Represented By: Stephen S. Churchill
Represented By: Hilary Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Last Mile, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Hoffman
Represented By: Adam L. Lounsbury
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Last Mile, Inc. doing business as XPO Logistics Inc
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Represented By: Adam L. Lounsbury
Represented By: Douglas J. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?