American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2019cv10291
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Bryce, Peter)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Bryce, Peter)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 Transcript of Status Conference held on February 27, 2019, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 3/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2019. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Status Conference held on 2/27/2019. The Court denies plaintiff's request for expedition and orders the case proceed in ordinary course. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney McFadden and Kennedy for the plaintiffs and Attorneys Bryce and Sady for the government) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Bryce, Peter)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McFadden, Daniel)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry #6 Summons Returned Executed as to the Office of US Attorney Corrected Because: Counsel Kennedy Filed The Summons Returned Executed Under The Wrong Event in CM/ECF. The Summons Was Re-Docketed As ECF No. #9 and the Answer Deadlines Corrected. (Paine, Matthew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Paine, Matthew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Kennedy, Alycia)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Kennedy, Alycia)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. Due to the request of the plaintiff for expedition of this matter, counsel for the plaintiff shall notify counsel for the defendants of this hearing. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (McFadden, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7542095 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Kennedy, Alycia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Peter Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Peter Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Represented By: Alycia M. Kennedy
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?