Butler v. Bateman et al
Plaintiff: Joseph G. Butler
Defendant: Town of Sebago, Maine, Robert E. Bateman and Leslie A. Bateman
Case Number: 1:2019cv10348
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 14 Bankruptcy Record Received (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(Paine, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Prescott on behalf of Town of Sebago, Maine (Prescott, Adam)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Keach on behalf of Town of Sebago, Maine (Keach, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered re #10 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE September 15, 2019 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE October 15, 2019. (Paine, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Hixon, Jonathan)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Davis Whitesell on behalf of Leslie A. Bateman, Robert E. Bateman (Whitesell, A.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Fencer on behalf of Leslie A. Bateman, Robert E. Bateman (Fencer, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Bednarz on behalf of Leslie A. Bateman, Robert E. Bateman (Bednarz, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held at BU Law School on 3/25/2019 re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Joseph G. Butler. After hearing from counsel, the Court enters an order granting #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Counsel shall file a joint proposed case management schedule within 14 days. The case is placed on the running trial list for January 2020. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 15, 2019. The motion to dismiss will be set for a prompt hearing once filed on the docket. (Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young.) (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Hixon for the plaintiff, Attorney Fencer for Bateman defendants and Attorney Cloherty for the town) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference : Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2019 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will take place at Boston University Law School, 765 Commonwealth Avenue, 6th Floor, Boston, MA. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Docket Sheet from Bankruptcy Court Record re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Joseph G. Butler. (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Joseph G. Butler. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Bateman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Sebago, Maine
Represented By: John J. Cloherty, III
Represented By: Adam R. Prescott
Represented By: Robert J. Keach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Bateman
Represented By: Michael J. Fencer
Represented By: A. Davis Whitesell
Represented By: Michael A. Bednarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie A. Bateman
Represented By: Michael J. Fencer
Represented By: A. Davis Whitesell
Represented By: Michael A. Bednarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph G. Butler
Represented By: Jonathan Hixon
Represented By: James M. Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?