Jennings v. O'Reilly Auto Parts

Plaintiff: Wayne Jennings
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Parts
Case Number: 1:2019cv10362
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed O'Reilly Auto Parts served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Boney, Emily Joan)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Meyer on behalf of Wayne Jennings (Meyer, Jonathan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Auto Parts. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against O'Reilly Auto Parts Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7558054 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Wayne Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Davis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. O'Reilly Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jennings
Represented By: John W. Davis
Represented By: Jonathan H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?