Hod v. General Hospital Corporation, The et al

Plaintiff: M.D. Tamar Hod
Defendant: Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc., Dr. Joseph V. Bonventre, Partners HealthCare System, Inc. and General Hospital Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv10365
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F. Bright, II on behalf of Partners HealthCare System, Inc. (Bright, Thomas)
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION Joint Confidentiality Stipulation by Tamar Hod. (Hagan, Colin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Tamar Hod.(Hagan, Colin)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record from Suffolk Superior Court. (Kinsella, Devan)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Partners HealthCare System, Inc..(Reardon, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Joseph V. Bonventre, Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc., General Hospital Corporation, The.(Sullivan, Eugene)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Partners HealthCare System, Inc.. (Reardon, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Partners HealthCare System, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Consent to Removal (Reardon, John)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Reardon on behalf of Partners HealthCare System, Inc. (Reardon, John)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Hospital Corporation, The identifying Corporate Parent Partners HealthCare System, Inc. for General Hospital Corporation, The.. (Sullivan, Eugene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Partners Health Care System, Inc. for Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc... (Sullivan, Eugene)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against General Hospital Corporation, The, Joseph V. Bonventre, Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7559078 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by General Hospital Corporation, The, Joseph V. Bonventre, Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 category form)(Sullivan, Eugene) Modified on 2/27/2019 (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hod v. General Hospital Corporation, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Tamar Hod
Represented By: Colin R. Hagan
Represented By: David J. Shlansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigham and Women's Hospital Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Joseph V. Bonventre
Represented By: Eugene J Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners HealthCare System, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene J Sullivan, III
Represented By: John J. Reardon
Represented By: Thomas F. Bright, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Hospital Corporation, The
Represented By: Eugene J Sullivan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?