Lima v. Lyons et al

Plaintiff: Moises Enrique Lima
Defendant: Acting Atty. General Matthew G Whitaker, Superintendent Antone Moniz, Sherriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr., Secretary Kristjen M. Nielsen and Mr. Todd Lyons
Case Number: 1:2019cv10400
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Piemonte, Eve)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Moises Enrique Lima. (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(Rubin, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/8/2019 to seal Exhibit A, as it contains personal identifier information (DOB) (Montes, Mariliz).
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Todd Lyons, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, Kristjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Piemonte, Eve)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Todd Lyons, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, Kristjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G Whitaker.(Piemonte, Eve)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Piemonte, Eve)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of Todd Lyons, Joseph D. McDonald, Jr, Antone Moniz, Kristjen M. Nielsen, Matthew G Whitaker (Piemonte, Eve)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Judge Mark L. Wolf: "...[I]t is hereby ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of this Court shall serve forthwith a copy of the petition (Docket No. 1) upon respondents and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2. The parties, including the United States, shall confer and, by March 14, 2019, report, jointly if possible, but separately if necessary: (a) whether they have reached an agreement to resolve this case; and, if not, (b) whether they request more time to continue their discussions and/or for the briefing required in paragraph 3 of this Order. 3. If the parties have not reached an agreement to resolve the case, respondents shall, by March 21, 2019, respond to the petition. See 28 U.S.C. 2243. Enrique Lima shall file any reply by March 29, 2019. 4. In order to preserve the court's jurisdiction, to provide the parties an opportunity to attempt to resolve this case and, if necessary, to brief the issues properly, petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts, temporarily or permanently, during the pendency of this case. See 28 U.S.C. 1651(a) ("[A]11 courts established by Act of Congress may issue all writs necessary or appropriate in aid of their respective jurisdictions and agreeable to the usages and principles of law."). This requirement may be reconsidered by the court sua sponte or upon motion by either party." ORDER entered. (Bono, Christine)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7566448 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Moises Enrique Lima. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Addendum)(Rubin, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lima v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Atty. General Matthew G Whitaker
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherriff Joseph D. McDonald, Jr.
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kristjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Todd Lyons
Represented By: Eve A. Piemonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Enrique Lima
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?