Erickson v. FCA US LLC

Plaintiff: Carl Erickson
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10415
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2019. Initial disclosures due by 6/4/19. Plaintiff's counsel will provide the disclosures and all of the relevant medical records of plaintiff, or releases, by 5/30/19. Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2019. Fact discovery to be completed by 4/17/2020. Court is not inclined to extend this schedule. Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper at which time the Court will revisit setting expert discovery deadline and summary judgment filing deadline. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jessica Gray and Peter Ainsworth for the plaintiff. Peter Durney and Christopher Fitzgerald for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Ainsworth, Peter)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3). (Durney, Peter)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(d). (Durney, Peter)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record FCA US LLC summons served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance with L.R. 81.1(a) and Certificate of Service)(Fitzgerald, Christopher)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to April 19, 2019 by FCA US LLC.(Durney, Peter)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC.(Durney, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Hartnett on behalf of FCA US LLC (Hartnett, Patricia)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Fitzgerald on behalf of FCA US LLC (Fitzgerald, Christopher)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V. for FCA US LLC.. (Durney, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of FCA US LLC (Durney, Peter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7568747 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Summons), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Complaint and Claim for Jury Trial), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (Civil Action Cover Sheet), #4 Exhibit Exhibit D (Civil Tracking Order), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet (USDC), #6 JS45 Category Form)(Durney, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Represented By: Christopher P. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Patricia A. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Erickson
Represented By: Peter J. Ainsworth
Represented By: Jessica M. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?