U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. DiNapoli et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Defendant: Sentry Insurance, Dorothy Sajous, Olde Center Ventures, Inc., Pasquale Trotta, Bank of America, N.A., Suzanne Y. Thompson, Lawrence Masonry Supplies, Inc. and Anthony D. DiNapoli
Case Number: 1:2019cv10416
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Bank of America, N.A. served on 4/19/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A..(Casey, Matthew)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew C. Casey on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Casey, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Suzanne Y. Thompson served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Sentry Insurance served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anthony D. DiNapoli served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lawrence Masonry Supplies, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Olde Center Ventures, Inc. served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Longoria, Reneau)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Anthony D. DiNapoli, Lawrence Masonry Supplies, Inc., Olde Center Ventures, Inc., Dorothy Sajous, Sentry Insurance, Suzanne Y. Thompson, Pasquale Trotta. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Longoria, Reneau)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Interpleader against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7569422 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-AA, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Longoria, Reneau)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust v. DiNapoli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Reneau J. Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Sajous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olde Center Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquale Trotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Y. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Masonry Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony D. DiNapoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?