LaCure v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward LaCure
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10500
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Court will hold Status Conferences on October 2, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. and December 4, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The parties shall file joint status reports due by September 30, 2019 and December 2, 2019. (York, Steve)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by all parties.(Beatty, Barbara)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's Notes for Scheduling Conference held held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court reviews #10 Joint Statement with counsel. Parties consent to transfer the case to a magistrate judge. Fact discovery to be completed by 11/29/2019. Status conference to be scheduled before the Magistrate Judge within 30 days after fact discovery is complete to discuss summary judgment practice or expert disclosures as the next stage in the case. Consent signed by parties in open court. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Biller, Cabantog) (Beatty, Barbara)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1. Filed by Edward LaCure. (Kinsella, Devan) Filed by hand by attorney Richard C. Biller.
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Cabantog, Lorenzo)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Conference SCHEDULED for 5/13/2019 at 2:40 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Stephanian Burton, Lisa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Stephanian Burton, Lisa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Stephanian Burton, Lisa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Stephanian Burton on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Stephanian Burton, Lisa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorenzo Rabajante Cabantog on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Cabantog, Lorenzo)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McKillop, Matthew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Air Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7588509 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Stephanian Burton, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaCure v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Stephanian Burton
Represented By: Lorenzo Rabajante Cabantog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward LaCure
Represented By: Richard C. Biller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?