Doucet et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Sutton and Amy Doucet
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Sudbay Chrysler Dodge, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10514
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FCA US LLC. (Durney, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 41 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Durney, Peter)
July 10, 2019 Filing 39 Opposition re #38 MOTION for Discovery filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Hampshire Order Allowing Motion to Dismiss and Denying Jurisdictional Discovery)(Durney, Peter)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Discovery by Amy Doucet.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Amy Doucet. (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
June 27, 2019 Filing 36 Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Amy Doucet. (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 35 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: #26 Motion to Extend Time to Oppose FCA's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss by June 28, 2019. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to File opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss filed by FCA US LLC. (Durney, Peter)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to FCA US LLC's Motion to Dismiss by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to FCA US LLC'S Motion to Dismiss)(Durney, Peter)
June 4, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to File opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss filed by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton. (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 30 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to FCA US LLC Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to FCA US LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 Opposition re #26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to File opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss filed by FCA US LLC. (Durney, Peter)
May 29, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to File opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss FCA US LLC's Notice of Intent to Oppose Plaintiffs' Third Motion for an Extension filed by FCA US LLC. (Durney, Peter)
May 29, 2019 Filing 26 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to File opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by FCA US LLC. (Durney, Peter)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by FCA US LLC.(Durney, Peter)
May 16, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton. (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to FCA US LLC Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 Opposition re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit New Hampshire Motion to Dismiss Memorandum Order, #2 Exhibit Hearing Transcript-NH Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit MTA, #4 Exhibit Sale Order, #5 Exhibit Order Approving MTA Amend. No. 4, #6 Exhibit MTA Amend. No. 4)(Durney, Peter)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/30/19 to respond to motion to dismiss. (Folan, Karen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/30/2019 to File opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sudbay Chrysler Dodge, Inc..(Smith, Ryan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Amy Doucet)(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand)(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT Record. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time (Folan, Karen)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to May 9, 2019 to File Opposition to FCA US LLC Motion to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(2) by Amy Doucet, Denise Sutton.(Nebenzahl, Andrew)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NH Memorandum Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Master Transaction Agreement, #4 Exhibit Bankruptcy Sale Order, #5 Exhibit Order Approving MTA Amend. Number 4, #6 Exhibit MTA Amend. Number 4)(Durney, Peter)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by FCA US LLC.(Durney, Peter)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. Smith on behalf of Sudbay Chrysler Dodge, Inc. (Smith, Ryan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Nebenzahl on behalf of Denise Sutton (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Nebenzahl on behalf of Amy Doucet (Nebenzahl, Andrew)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (DeMaria, Timothy).
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Hurst on behalf of FCA US LLC (Hurst, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC for FCA US LLC.. (Durney, Peter)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7591063 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - NH Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - NH Dismissal Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - MA State Court Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Master Transaction Agreement, #5 Exhibit Bankruptcy Sale Order, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - MTA Amend. No. 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Order Approving Amend No. 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Cover Letter to State Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Local Category Form)(Durney, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doucet et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Hurst
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudbay Chrysler Dodge, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Sutton
Represented By: Andrew D. Nebenzahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Doucet
Represented By: Andrew D. Nebenzahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?