EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC v. Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC

Plaintiff: EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10522
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-02155.
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 Opinion and Order. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the alternative, to Transfer (Related doc #5 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts for further proceedings. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/19/2019. (H,CM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to excuse appearance of representative at conference (Related Doc #12 ). Plaintiff's Motion to continue (Related Doc #13 ) is granted; case management conference reset to be held on 3/22/2019 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/19/2019.(H,CM)
February 18, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
February 18, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to cancel case management conference or, in the alternative, Motion to excuse presence appearance filed by Defendant Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. Related document(s) #11 . (Braga, Annamarie). Added Motion to cancel case management conference on 2/19/2019 (L,Ja).
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/8/2019 at 02:00 PM at Chambers 15B. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(H,CM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Reply in support of #5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative Motion to transfer this case filed by Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. (Jacobs, Mark)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #9 Motion for extension of time until 1/17/2019 to file reply in support of Motion to dismiss, or in the alternative to transfer case. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/26/2018.(H,CM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 17, 2019 to file response/reply to #5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative Motion to transfer this case filed by Defendant Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. Related document(s) #5 . (Jacobs, Mark)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Brief of Plaintiff EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC in Opposition to Defendant Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Daniel Weinmann, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Matthew T. Fitzsimmons) (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to exceed page limitations by five pages (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 12/17/2018.(H,CM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations by five pages in reply to #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. (Jacobs, Mark)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, to Transfer this Case filed by Defendant Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rudy Dajie, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark R. Jacobs)(Jacobs, Mark). AddedMotion to transfer case on 11/21/2018 (L,Ja).
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018 filed on behalf of EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ky)
September 19, 2018 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (D,Ky)
September 19, 2018 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (D,Ky)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint against Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8916192. Filed by EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Sell-Side Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Buyers Lists, #5 Exhibit 3 to Complaint - Announcement) (Fitzsimmons, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC v. Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apothecare Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Annamarie E. Braga
Represented By: Mark Robinson Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EdgePoint Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: R. Christopher Yingling
Represented By: Matthew T. Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?