Slugina et al v. POMPEO et al

Plaintiff: Albina Slugina and Tatiana Slugina
Defendant: Edward J Ramotowski, Michael L Yoder and Michael Richard POMPEO
Case Number: 1:2019cv10659
Filed: April 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Michael Richard POMPEO, Edward J Ramotowski, Michael L Yoder. (Poswistilo, Susan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Albina Slugina, Tatiana Slugina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - current visa application status)(Romanovsky, Gregory)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2019 re #2 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Mandamus Complaint filed by Albina Slugina, Tatiana Slugina, ( Status Report due by 5/10/2019). (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Romanovsky & Poswistilo) (Urso, Lisa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Mandamus Complaint filed by Michael Richard POMPEO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Susan M. Poswistilo attaching email correspondence, #2 Exhibit exhibit to declaration, email chain between S.M. Poswistilo and G. Romanovsky)(Poswistilo, Susan)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Mandamus Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. Government shall file any opposition before noon on Monday 4/22. (Urso, Lisa)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Poswistilo on behalf of Michael Richard POMPEO, Edward J Ramotowski, Michael L Yoder (Poswistilo, Susan)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Michael Richard POMPEO, Edward J Ramotowski, Michael L Yoder. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 6, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Mandamus Complaint by Albina Slugina, Tatiana Slugina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Wilbraham & Monson Academy)(Romanovsky, Gregory)
April 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Review of Agency Action under the APA against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7624218 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Albina Slugina, Tatiana Slugina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Immigrant Petition Approval, #2 Exhibit B - Receipt for visa fee payment, #3 Exhibit C - Consular Interview Notice, #4 Exhibit D1 - Plaintiffs' inquiries, #5 Exhibit D2 - Plaintiffs' inquiries, #6 Exhibit D3 - Congressional inquiry, #7 Exhibit E - Current application status, #8 Exhibit F - Letter from school, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 JS45)(Romanovsky, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slugina et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J Ramotowski
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L Yoder
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richard POMPEO
Represented By: Susan M. Poswistilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albina Slugina
Represented By: Gregory Romanovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Slugina
Represented By: Gregory Romanovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?