AVENDANO v. BALZA
Plaintiff: VERONICA LUZ MALAVER AVENDANO
Defendant: LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA
Case Number: 1:2019cv10660
Filed: April 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Referring Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Scheduling and Pretrial ORDER entered. (Folan, Karen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Scheduling Conference held on 6/20/2019. Trial estimated to be 1 week or less. Court will look into appointing a representative for the child. Bench Trial set for 9/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Barach, McSherry) (Folan, Karen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (McSherry, Dana)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Leave to File Granted 6.11.19 [Dkt# 6] by LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA.(McSherry, Dana)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA. (McSherry, Dana)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McSherry, Dana)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shamis N. Beckley on behalf of LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA (Beckley, Shamis)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana M. McSherry on behalf of LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA (McSherry, Dana) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/23/2019) (McDonagh, Christina).
May 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Plaintiff Veronica Luz Malaver Avendano's Motion for Default Judgment, which the Court will construe as a motion for entry of default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), [ECF No. #6 ], is resolved considering that Defendant has filed an answer and an opposition. [ECF Nos. #7 , #9 ]. In the opposition, Defendant explained why the filing was late. Given the circumstances and the fact that Defendant is representing himself, the Court accepts the answer as timely filed. Defendant is cautioned that future pleadings must be filed on time and in accordance with any schedule set by the court. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Opposition re #6 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to 5-1-19 filed by LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. Judge Rya W. Zobel no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(McKillop, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to 5-1-19 by VERONICA LUZ MALAVER AVENDANO.(Barach, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Barach, Matthew)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 8, 2019 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 04/07/2019, receipt number 0101-7624245. (Tran, Henry)
April 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7624248 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by VERONICA LUZ MALAVER AVENDANO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barach, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #3 Category Form) (Pacho, Arnold). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/8/2019) (Pacho, Arnold). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2019: #4 Exhibit A-B) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 4/8/2019 to separate exhibits A-B from the complaint (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVENDANO v. BALZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA LUZ MALAVER AVENDANO
Represented By: Matthew P Barach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEONARDO ALFONZO BLANCO BALZA
Represented By: Dana M. McSherry
Represented By: Shamis N. Beckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?