Wollaston Industries, LLC v. Ciccone et al

Plaintiff: Wollaston Industries, LLC
Defendant: Frank E. Ciccone, R.E. Ciccone Door Services, LLC and Robert E. Ciccone
Not Yet Classified: Judge Edward F. Harrington
Case Number: 1:2019cv10678
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 Amended JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D). (Spinella, Frank)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel re Settlement. (Spinella, Frank)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 Counsel notified the Court hat this case did not settle. They will be filing a Joint Status Report indicating the same. (McLaughlin, Tracy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE: Parties are hereby Ordered to file a Joint Status Report on or before 7/8/19 re: status of settlement. (Molloy, Maryellen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. Progress was made in this case. Counsel will notify the Court by July 8, 2019 as to whether the case has settled or not.(McLaughlin, Tracy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Relating to Hiring an Accountant. (Spinella, Frank)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 6/18/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20 before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. Counsel and principals are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via email as an attachment to tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov or facsimile to (617) 204-5801 by 6/12/2019 at 12:00P.M. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date poses a serious conflict, please contact Tracy McLaughlin at the email address above.(McLaughlin, Tracy)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Edward F. Harrington appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for JUNE 2019.(Molloy, Maryellen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference... (2nd) Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Pltf Atty Bland shall file a Pro hac vice motion forthwith and also find local counsel asap.Scheduling Conference held on 5/7/2019..Joint Statement - Adopted. All Discovery Stayed except Auto Disclosures. Parties shall consider hiring an Accountant to review the necessary documents. Counsel shall file a letter by 5/21/19 re: status of Accountant. Further 16.b set for 7/18/19 at 3:00pm. Parties agree to refer matter to ADR for June 2019.(Atty Bland, Spinella Jr.,) (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Molloy, Maryellen)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Robert E. Ciccone, CD of State Court Record. (Lara, Miguel)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Lara, Miguel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Wollaston Industries, LLC by R.E. Ciccone Door Services, LLC, Frank E. Ciccone, Robert E. Ciccone.(Spinella, Frank)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(D). (Spinella, Frank)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Spinella, Frank)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Copy re #5 Notice of Scheduling Conference mailed to Wollaston Industries, LLC, c/o Richard W. Bland II at 18 Johnson Drive, Norton, MA, 021766, on 4/11/19. (Lara, Miguel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen).
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert E. Ciccone (Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7627804 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Spinella, Frank). Main Document 1 replaced on 4/9/2019 to separate exhibits from Notice of Removal (Kinsella, Devan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wollaston Industries, LLC v. Ciccone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank E. Ciccone
Represented By: Frank P. Spinella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.E. Ciccone Door Services, LLC
Represented By: Frank P. Spinella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Ciccone
Represented By: Frank P. Spinella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wollaston Industries, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Bland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge Edward F. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?