Children's Hospital Corporation v. His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia et al

Plaintiff: Children's Hospital Corporation
Defendant: His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia and Dr. Hamdy Dawoud
Case Number: 1:2019cv10679
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2019 02:45 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Butters on behalf of Dr. Hamdy Dawoud, His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia (Butters, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dr. Hamdy Dawoud.(Brazilian, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia.(Brazilian, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Brazilian on behalf of Dr. Hamdy Dawoud, His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia (Brazilian, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Children's Hospital Corporation. Dr. Hamdy Dawoud waiver sent on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Willis, Jane)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Children's Hospital Corporation. His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Willis, Jane)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna B. FitzGerald on behalf of Children's Hospital Corporation (FitzGerald, Deanna)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Children's Hospital Corporation. (Willis, Jane)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Children's Hospital Corporation. (Willis, Jane)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dr. Hamdy Dawoud, His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7627905 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Children's Hospital Corporation.(Willis, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Children's Hospital Corporation v. His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: His Royal Highness Prince Abdelilah Bin Abdelaziz Bin Abdulrahman Al Faisal Al Saud of Saudi Arabia
Represented By: Thomas J Butters
Represented By: John H. Brazilian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hamdy Dawoud
Represented By: Thomas J Butters
Represented By: John H. Brazilian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Children's Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Deanna B. FitzGerald
Represented By: Jane E. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?