Peulic v. Moniz
Plaintiff: Igor Peulic
Defendant: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2019cv10687
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Igor Peulic to #18 Memorandum re Petition. (Rangaviz, David)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Petitioner shall file any reply memorandum on or before the close of business on Friday, June 21, 2019.(MacDougall, Patricia)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Antone Moniz in Opposition re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),. (Lumelsky, Anna)
May 8, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion For Emergency Relief. It is hereby ORDERED that, in order to preserve the court's jurisdiction and to provide the parties with the opportunity to brief the issues properly, the named petitioner shall not be moved outside the District of Massachusetts, temporarily or permanently, during the pendency of this case. See 28 U.S.C. 1651(a) ("[A]ll courts established by Act of Congress may issue all writs necessary or appropriate in aid of their respective jurisdictions and agreeable to the usages and principles of law."). This requirement may be reconsidered by the court sua sponte or upon motion by either party. (MacDougall, Patricia)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered re #12 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Kelley. Approved. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Order to preserve jurisdiction by barring ICE from removing petitioner from United States or Commonwealth of Massachusetts. by Igor Peulic.(Rangaviz, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Igor Peulic.. (Rangaviz, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The time within which Respondent is to file his opposition to the petition is extended to the close of business on June 6, 2019.(MacDougall, Patricia)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered amending the briefing schedule 8 . Petitioner has filed already his memorandum of law [1-1] and appendix [1-5]. Because Petitioner will be filing nothing further in support of his petition (see [1-4 at 2]), Respondent shall file a memorandum of law in opposition to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by May 31, 2019. Petitioner may seek leave to file a reply if warranted.(MacDougall, Patricia)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Pacho, Arnold)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the petitioner's request to expedite, the court sets the following briefing schedule. Petitioner to file a memorandum of law by May 24, 2019, and Respondent to file memorandum of law in opposition to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by June 14, 2019. Reply with leave of court.(Zierk, Marsha)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE/ANSWER to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Antone Moniz. (Lumelsky, Anna)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna E. Lumelsky on behalf of Antone Moniz (Lumelsky, Anna)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Copy re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) and #4 Order, mailed to Superintendent Antone Moniz (Plymouth County Correctional Facility), Massachusetts Attorney General and US Attorney for the District of Massachusetts, on 4/12/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part #3 Motion to Expedite. (mkz)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite by Igor Peulic.(Rangaviz, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-7629545 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Igor Peulic. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Habeas Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Civil Category Form, #4 Supplement Motion to Expedite Consideration of Petition, #5 Appendix Petitioner's Appendix)(Rangaviz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peulic v. Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Represented By: Anna E. Lumelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Peulic
Represented By: David R. Rangaviz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?