Tiah v. Lyons et al

Petitioner: Morris Tiah
Respondent: Steven Souza, Todd Lyons and Thomas Hodgson
Case Number: 1:2019cv10688
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. Request DENIED as moot re #9 Notice of Removal filed by Steven Souza (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Steven Souza ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Johnson, Anita)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Souza. (Johnson, Anita)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven Souza.(Johnson, Anita)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Thomas Hodgson, Todd Lyons, Steven Souza (Johnson, Anita)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. (PSSA, 5)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Morris Tiah.(Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiah v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Souza
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Lyons
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Morris Tiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?