Allen v. Glaxosmithkline LLC

Plaintiff: Adrienne Allen
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10694
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (800) 459-5346 and Conference ID: Zofran for the Status Conference set for July 10, 2019 at 1:30 PM Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 34. ORDER FURTHER SUPPLEMENTING AND MODIFYING MDL ORDER NOS. 30 AND 31. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 6/11/2019.(1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.(2) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 fact discovery. (3) The Court heard updates on Phase 5 expert discovery, including Magistrate Judge Dein's recently issued order on plaintiffs motions to compel in Fluth v. GSK, Case No. 1:17-cv-10066. (4) The Court heard updates on Phase 5, Group 1 trial selections, including Rodriguez v. GSK, Case No. 1:15-cv-13762, the first case selected for trial.(5) A colloquy was held about how the Court should proceed in light of the United States Supreme Court's recently issued decision in Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. v. Albrecht. The parties will have until 7/1/2019 to file any additional briefing on the question of preemption, such as a renewed motion for summary judgment. Any oppositions will be due 7/9/2019. The Court will take the matter up at the 7/10/2019 status conference.(6) A colloquy was held about trial logistics and setting a timetable for further pretrial filings.(7) The Court heard updates on GSK's motion for summary judgment based on lack of general causation evidence, and a colloquy was held about filing logistics. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Pezzarossi, Lisa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 4/12/2019; trial selection (Bellwether) and Daubert Hearing logistics addressed; Amended Master Complaint addressed; Court will issue a procedural Order re trial selection; parties nearing agreement re Daubert; hearing dates of the week of 9/9/2019 may move to 9/16/19; 2 proposed amended master complaints will be filed for the Court's review. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com)(Attorneys present: Various by telephone) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Lovett, Jarrett)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Allen v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7632574 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Adrienne Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Local Category Form)(Burke, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Glaxosmithkline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Allen
Represented By: Daniel C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?