Beth v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Connelly Beth and Beth Connelly
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Tenmarks Education, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10713
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Duke on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc., Tenmarks Education, LLC (Duke, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Amazon.com, Inc., and Tenmarks Education, LLC, having filed their Answer on June 3, 2019, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 6/28/19; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties are due by 8/16/19. Without leave of court, the court permits 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the next 45 days, and expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If all parties are interested in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) by 10/4/19 (it may take several weeks to get a mediation date). All fact discovery must be completed no later than 12/6/19. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/6/20, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 1/27/20; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 11/6/19, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule (Zierk, Marsha)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc., Tenmarks Education, LLC. (Mankes, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Amazon.com, Inc., Tenmarks Education, LLC.(Mankes, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered, treating the parties stipulation as a motion for extension of time and granting, permitting defendants until June 3, 2019 to respond to the Complaint. The court reminds the parties that any alteration to the dictates of the federal procedural rules must come by way of an Order of the court. (Zierk, Marsha)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, Extension of Time to Respond to June 3, 2019 by Amazon.com, Inc., Tenmarks Education, LLC. (Mankes, Michael)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Beth Connelly. Tenmarks Education, LLC served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Beth Connelly. (Buzzard, Lucas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Beth Connelly. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Beth Connelly. (Buzzard, Lucas)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Lucas C. Buzzard. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lucas C. Buzzard Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7635605 by Connelly Beth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Lucas C. Buzzard, Esq.))(Mensing, Blake)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7635458 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Connelly Beth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Form)(Mensing, Blake) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #3 Exhibit A and B) (Coppola, Katelyn). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/15/2019) (Coppola, Katelyn). Modified on 4/15/2019 to separate exhibits from complaint and add as attachment (Coppola, Katelyn). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/10/2019) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 5/10/2019 to redact DOB from exhibit and make entry public (Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beth v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connelly Beth
Represented By: Blake M. Mensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Connelly
Represented By: Blake M. Mensing
Represented By: Lucas C. Buzzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Duke
Represented By: Michael Mankes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenmarks Education, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Duke
Represented By: Michael Mankes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?