In Re. Captain Juan, Inc.

In Re: Captain Juan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10719
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER Approving Appraiser's Report, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing #7 MOTION for Order to Approve Appraiser's Report, Direct Issuance of Notice, and Restrain Prosecution of Claims by Captain Juan, Inc. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Order to Approve Appraiser's Report, Direct Issuance of Notice, and Restrain Prosecution of Claims by Captain Juan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Appraiser's Report, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Notice of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation Of Liability)(McSweeney, Francis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Captain Juan, Inc. re 5 Order on Motion to Appoint Expert Petitioner's Submission of Appraisal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appraiser's Report)(McSweeney, Francis)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered allowing #4 Motion to Appoint Expert. (Lara, Miguel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Expert Appraiser by Captain Juan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Curriculum Vitae of Dana P. Collyer, NAMS-CMS, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McSweeney, Francis)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis G. McSweeney on behalf of Captain Juan, Inc., as owner of the F/V CAPTAIN BILLY HAVER (McSweeney, Francis)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7636405 Fee status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Captain Juan, Inc., as owner of the F/V CAPTAIN BILLY HAVER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Regan, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Captain Juan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Captain Juan, Inc.
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Represented By: Joseph A. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?