Zoll Medical Corporation V. Evans et al

Plaintiff: Zoll Medical Corporation and Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc.
Defendant: James Evans and William Wiesmann
Case Number: 1:2019cv10724
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Shanahan, Sara)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Gray Kelly on behalf of Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Zoll Medical Corporation (Kelly, Jessica)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zoll Medical Corporation. (Shanahan, Sara)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zoll Medical Corporation for Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc... (Shanahan, Sara)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Wiesmann, James Evans Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7637024 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc., Zoll Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Shanahan, Sara) Modified on 4/16/2019 to fix docket text (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zoll Medical Corporation V. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoll Medical Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Gray Kelly
Represented By: Sara Jane Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Circulatory Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Gray Kelly
Represented By: Sara Jane Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wiesmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?