U.S. Bank National Association v. Finley
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Donald R. Finley, Donald Finley and Donald R. Rinley
Case Number: 1:2019cv10737
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald R. Finley served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Linehan, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference has been set for 7/17/2019 02:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 scheduling order sample, #2 standing order re summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Donald R. Finley.(Daigle, Peter)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 7/16/2019. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Donald R. Finley. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association, as Successor in interest to Bank of America National Association, the successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, as trustee for Thornburg Mortgage Securi. (Linehan, Brian)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald R. Finley a/k/a Donald Finley a/k/a Donald R. Rinley Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7640523 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Successor in interest to Bank of America National Association, the successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, as trustee for Thornburg Mortgage Securi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Exhibit M-S, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Linehan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Finley
Represented By: Peter M. Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Finley
Represented By: Peter M. Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald R. Rinley
Represented By: Peter M. Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?