O'Riorden v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Lorraine O'Riorden
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv10751
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Boston Office
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's motion to remand [ECF No. #7 ] is GRANTED. This action isremanded to the Massachusetts Superior Court for Middlesex County.SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 Letter/request (non-motion) from Leah M. McMorris to The Honorable Allison D. Burroughs. (McMorris, Leah)
May 30, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lorraine O'Riorden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(McMorris, Leah)
May 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie-Anne Taylor on behalf of Lorraine O'Riorden (Taylor, Leslie-Anne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Marino Landry on behalf of Lorraine O'Riorden (Landry, Andrea)
May 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Hoffman on behalf of Lorraine O'Riorden (Hoffman, Evan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bricker on behalf of Lorraine O'Riorden (Bricker, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Response to Defendant Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Remand to State Court by Lorraine O'Riorden.(McMorris, Leah)
May 16, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel P. McCarthy)(McCarthy, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s request to extend the deadline to transmit the full state court record [ECF No. #14 ] is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(a), the Court orders that the state court records required by Local Rule 5.4(f) to be filed within 28 days of removal shall be filed no later than 5 business days following the earlier of: (i) a venue-fixing order from the District of Delaware related to Imerys' bankruptcy proceeding transferring this proceeding to the District of Delaware or (ii) an order denying Plaintiff's motion to remand [ECF No. #7 ]. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Letter/request (non-motion) from Marisa K. Pearson Requesting an Extension to Supply State Court Records. (Pearson, Marisa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum in Excess of 20 Pages in Support of it's Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Remand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc..(McCarthy, Daniel)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff Lorraine O'Riorden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McMorris, Leah)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Letter/request (non-motion) from Marisa K. Pearson Counsel for Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. To the Honorable Allison D. Burroughs. (Pearson, Marisa)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lorraine O'Riorden. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Her Emergency Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(McMorris, Leah)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (McCarthy, Daniel)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa K. Pearson on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Pearson, Marisa)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (McCarthy, Daniel)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7643626 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McCarthy, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Riorden v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine O'Riorden
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Represented By: Andrea Marino Landry
Represented By: Evan R. Hoffman
Represented By: David Bricker
Represented By: Leslie-Anne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Marisa K. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Daniel P. McCarthy
Represented By: Marisa K. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?