Finnerty v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Donna Finnerty
Defendant: AURORA, Delaval Steam Turbine Company, Eckel Industries Inc., Buffalo Pumps, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Eaton Corp., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Eastern Refractories Company Inc., CBS Corporation, Durez Plastics and Chemical, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Aurora Pump Company, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc. and Warren Pumps, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10752
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Durez Plastics and Chemical. (Gross, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander L. Zodikoff on behalf of Durez Plastics and Chemical (Zodikoff, Alexander)
July 2, 2019 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Asbestos Docket by Defendants Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chambers, Gregory)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Gross on behalf of Durez Plastics and Chemical (Gross, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aurora Pump Company. (Rasmussen, Shaina) (Main Document 40 replaced on 6/20/2019 upon request from counsel due to typographical error within certificate of service) (Kinsella, Devan).
June 6, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Shaina A. Rasmussen on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Rasmussen, Shaina)
June 6, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of RSCC Wire & Cable, Inc.. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 6, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 5, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Waksler on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Waksler, Craig) (Main Document 36 replaced on 6/6/2019 upon request from counsel due to typographical error within certificate of service.) (Kinsella, Devan).
June 5, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Defendant, Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Zabbo, Timothy)
June 4, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
June 4, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company. (DeLuzio, Maria)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Conference is SCHEDULED for 7/18/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 22, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Union Carbide Corporation.(Adams, Kip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Carbide Corporation. (Adams, Kip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Nelson on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Nelson, Monica)
May 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip J. Adams on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Adams, Kip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Tauro on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Tauro, Christopher)
May 17, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Riordan, Meghan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Incorrectly named "The Rockbestos Company n/k/a Cerro Wire & Cable Company, Inc." (Riordan, Meghan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan L. Riordan on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Riordan, Meghan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (DeLuzio, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Incorrectly named "The Rockbestos Company n/k/a Cerro Wire & Cable Company, Inc." (DeLuzio, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria E. DeLuzio on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (DeLuzio, Maria)
May 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Perritano, Judith)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. f/k/a DeLaval Steam Turbine Company (Perritano, Judith)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Perritano on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, Incorrectly named "The Rockbestos Company n/k/a Cerro Wire & Cable Company, Inc." (Perritano, Judith)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. f/k/a Square D Company, Inc.. (Zabbo, Timothy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Zabbo on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc. f/k/a Square D Company, Inc. (Zabbo, Timothy)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Armato on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Armato, Stephen) (Main Document 14 replaced on 5/9/2019 to correct case caption) (Kinsella, Devan).
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G. Cetrulo on behalf of Defendants Liaison Counsel (Cetrulo, Lawrence) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/9/2019 to correct case caption) (Kinsella, Devan).
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Lee on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Lee, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joni K. Mackler on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Mackler, Joni)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Claflin, Mark)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Claflin on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Claflin, Mark)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, by CBS Corporation. (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation No Pending Motions (Moccia, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation identifying Corporate Parent GAMCO Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation.. (Moccia, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Moccia on behalf of CBS Corporation (Moccia, Anthony) Modified on 4/19/2019 (Caruso, Stephanie).
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CBS Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7643640 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Moccia, Anthony) Modified on 4/19/2019 (Caruso, Stephanie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finnerty v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaval Steam Turbine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Refractories Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Anthony M. Moccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durez Plastics and Chemical
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Alexander L. Zodikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Michael T. Lee
Represented By: Joni K. Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Monica R. Nelson
Represented By: Kip J. Adams
Represented By: Christopher M. Tauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Shaina A. Rasmussen
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Maria E. DeLuzio
Represented By: Judith A. Perritano
Represented By: Meghan L. Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Finnerty
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?