Faber v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deborah Faber
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Judge Donald L. Cabell
Case Number: 1:2019cv10765
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. NOTICE OF AND ORDER WITH RESPECT TO MEDIATION Mediation set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The parties shall exchange settlement proposals by no later than September 17, 2019 and inform the court immediately if they no longer believe it would be fruitful to hold the mediation. Confidential Mediation Statements are due by cob September 20, 2019. (Russo, Noreen)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Donald L. Cabell appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #10 letter. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (Pacho, Arnold)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Letter/request re settlement conference from Brooks R. Magratten. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered setting out briefing schedule. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company having filed its Answer, the court orders the following schedule:Any amendment to the pleadings must be made by June 28, 2019; defendant must provide its proposed record for judicial review by July 26, 2019; Deborah Faber must notify defendant's counsel in writing by August 16, 2019, if she believes that the record is inaccurate or incomplete. Any disagreement regarding the record must be filed with the court by September 6, 2019, setting out additional material the party seeks to add to the record. Any request for an entitlement to discovery must also be filed by September 6, 2019. If no disagreements or requests are filed, motion for judgment on the record must be filed by defendant by September 27, 2019, with Fabers response due by October 21, 2019. If there is a disagreement, dispositive motions are due thirty days from the court's response to the September 6, 2019 filings - with opposition 21 days thereafter. SO ORDERED.(Zierk, Marsha)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Magratten, Brooks)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #6 Motion for Extension of Time until May 31, 2019. Allowed, but in the future, this Session requires some basis for altering the time dictated by the federal procedural rules. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/31/19 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Magratten, Brooks)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Magratten, Brooks)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7643945 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Deborah Faber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Frim, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faber v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Faber
Represented By: Gerald S. Frim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Judge Donald L. Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?