Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lyons et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Eric D Lyons, Synchrony Capital Group, Synchrony Global Macro, LP, Synchrony Capital GP, LLC and Synchrony Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv10785
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Synchrony Capital Group served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Synchrony Global Macro, LP served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Synchrony Capital GP, LLC served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Synchrony Group, LLC served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard) (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/3/2019) to attach correct Return of Service per Attorney (Vieira, Leonardo).
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered.(Simeone, Maria)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Assented to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to cancel the May 1st hearing (Simeone, Maria)
April 30, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to cancel hearing scheduled for May 1, 2019 at 2:00pm by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Harper, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Eric D Lyons served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Leave to File Granted April 22,2019 filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2019 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; The court hears plaintiffs counsel on the #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . After an ex-parte hearing, the court allows the emergency motion without prejudice to re-issuing the order upon the appearance of any defendant and in response to any request made by that defendant. The court will hold a Motion Hearing on 5/1/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin.) re #3 Motion for TRO; (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ENDORSED ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER FREEZING ASSETS, AND ORDER FOR OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF(Montes, Mariliz)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Simeone, Maria)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Susan Curtin in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Rory Alex in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of William Donahue in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of William Donahue in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO)(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Harper, Richard)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Synchrony Global Macro, LP, Synchrony Group, LLC, Synchrony Capital GP, LLC, Eric D Lyons, Synchrony Capital Group (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Harper, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Lyons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric D Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Global Macro, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Capital GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Richard Mann Harper, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?