American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff: American Oversight and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv10916
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 31 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Lima, Christine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement by Department of Homeland Security (Sady, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 29 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 12/11/2019 (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/11/19 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security.(Sady, Michael)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #26 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of it to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Lima, Christine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight. (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Facts, #2 Affidavit of Katherine M. Anthony, #3 Exhibit 1)(Anthony, Katherine)
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight.(Anthony, Katherine)
October 2, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security.(Sady, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT AMENDED STATUS REPORT by Department of Homeland Security. (Sady, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Status Conference set for today, 9/4/19, is canceled. (Lima, Christine)
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by Department of Homeland Security. (Sady, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
August 31, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anthony, Katherine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Sady, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Sady, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Oversight.(Anthony, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF COUNSEL of Plaintiffs Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (McFadden, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security.(Sady, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (Sady, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Oversight. Acknowledgement filed by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Department of Homeland Security served on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Anthony on behalf of American Oversight (Anthony, Katherine)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Caruso, Stephanie)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (McFadden, Daniel)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7650653 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(McFadden, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Oversight
Represented By: Katherine M. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?