Earle et al v. Standard Process, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Antitrend LLC and Daniel R. Earle
Defendant: Standard Process, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv10952
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re #20 Reply to Response to Motion filed by The Antitrend LLC, Daniel R. Earle. Allowed to file. (Urso, Lisa)
June 12, 2019 Filing 20 Assented to REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Wells, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 Opposition to Motion for Remand (Gina Howden). (Allen, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 Opposition to Motion for Remand (Jason Wells). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 Opposition to Motion for Remand (William Kloss, Jr.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allen, Nicholas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Standard Process, Inc.. (Allen, Nicholas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William D. Kloss, Jr., Katherine Greiner Barnes,Angelyne Lisinski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court ( Responses due by 5/30/2019) by Daniel R. Earle, The Antitrend LLC.(Wells, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Thomson on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Thomson, James)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William D. Kloss, Jr.; Katherine Greiner Banks; Angelyne Lisinski Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-7668373 by Standard Process, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Allen, Nicholas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Toms on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Toms, Keith)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Standard Process, Inc..(Allen, Nicholas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Standard Process, Inc.. (Allen, Nicholas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Allen on behalf of Standard Process, Inc. (Allen, Nicholas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Process, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7653166 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Allen, Nicholas)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document 1 notice of case assignment corrected because: Entry made in error - docketed in the incorrect case. (Finn, Mary)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earle et al v. Standard Process, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Antitrend LLC
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Earle
Represented By: Brian K. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Process, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas W. Allen
Represented By: James J. Thomson
Represented By: Keith E. Toms
Represented By: Angelyne E. Lisinski
Represented By: Katherine Greiner Barnes
Represented By: William D. Kloss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?